This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 19:07:26 (UTC).

Chapel Ridge Investors of Claremore, LLC. DBA: Claremore Creek Apartments, Plaintiff, v. Jackson Alexander Martin, Defendant, and Dakota Wayne Cook, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Chapel Ridge Investors of Claremore, LLC DBA Claremore Creek Apartments, Plaintiff, filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jackson Alexander Martin, Defendant, and Dakota Wayne Cook, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-57

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chapel Ridge Investors of Claremore, LLC. DBA: Claremore Creek Apartments

Defendants

Martin, Jackson Alexander

Cook, Dakota Wayne

 

Court Documents

WILHOIT PROPERTIES INC - CLAREMORE CREEK RESIDENT CHARGES/PAYMENTS LEDGER

01/23/2020: WILHOIT PROPERTIES INC - CLAREMORE CREEK RESIDENT CHARGES/PAYMENTS LEDGER

JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR FED1 HEARING EVANGELA POSTMAN PRESENT, SWORN BOTH DEFENDANTS PRESENT, SWORN HEARING HELD FED GRANTED PROPERTY TO BE VACATED BY 2-2-2020 @ 11:59PM JUDGMENT GRANTED FOR $2,037.00 + CC + SERVICE

01/29/2020: JUDGE SMITH NO CR COMES ON FOR FED1 HEARING EVANGELA POSTMAN PRESENT, SWORN BOTH DEFENDANTS PRESENT, SWORN HEARING HELD FED GRANTED PROPERTY TO BE VACATED BY 2-2-2020 @ 11:59PM JUDGMENT GRANTED FOR $2,037.00 + CC + SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT

01/23/2020: AFFIDAVIT

ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED JACKSON MARTIN / 1-23-20) & (SERVED DAKOTA COOK BY LEAVING COPY WITH JACKSON MARTIN / 1-23-20) WITH AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED / $50

01/28/2020: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED JACKSON MARTIN / 1-23-20) & (SERVED DAKOTA COOK BY LEAVING COPY WITH JACKSON MARTIN / 1-23-20) WITH AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED / $50

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

01/30/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Cook, Dakota Wayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Martin, Jackson Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: FED1($1887.00 + $108.00 CC); Docket: David Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SMITH; NO CR COMES ON FOR FED1 HEARING; EVANGELA POSTMAN PRESENT, SWORN; BOTH DEFENDANTS PRESENT, SWORN; HEARING HELD; FED GRANTED; PROPERTY TO BE VACATED BY 2-2-2020 @ 11:59PM JUDGMENT GRANTED FOR $2,037.00 + CC + SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: ROGERS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED JACKSON MARTIN / 1-23-20) & (SERVED DAKOTA COOK BY LEAVING COPY WITH JACKSON MARTIN / 1-23-20) WITH AFFIDAVIT ATTACHED / $50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-609379 ON 01/23/2020. PAYOR: PROPERTIES/WILHOIT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 108.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2020-57: $43.88 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2020-57: $48.75 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2020-57: $2.70 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. SC-2020-57: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2020-57: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:SC-2020-57: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18SC-2020-57: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15SC-2020-57: AC08 SHERIFF FEES -$1.25SC-2020-57: AC01 CLERK FEES -$1.12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 2.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SMITH, DAVID TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WILHOIT PROPERTIES INC - CLAREMORE CREEK RESIDENT CHARGES/PAYMENTS LEDGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: SMIS; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: Chapel Ridge Investors of Claremore, LLC. DBA: Claremore Creek Apartments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less