This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 14:03:21 (UTC).

CENTRAL LOAN V. JACOB ALLEN WEST

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 CENTRAL LOAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACOB ALLEN WEST. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CAWTHON, J. DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CAWTHON, J. DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL LOAN

Defendant

WEST, JACOB ALLEN

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

01/13/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO JACOB A WEST - NOT FOUND

02/05/2021: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO JACOB A WEST - NOT FOUND

FILE COURT MINUTE: 30 DAYS TO ISSUE AN ALIAS AFFIDIT OF

02/24/2021: FILE COURT MINUTE: 30 DAYS TO ISSUE AN ALIAS AFFIDIT OF

FILE ALIAS AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER - HEARING

03/23/2021: FILE ALIAS AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER - HEARING

FILE HOA: PROOF OF SERVICE TO JACOB A WEST - NOT FOUND

09/24/2021: FILE HOA: PROOF OF SERVICE TO JACOB A WEST - NOT FOUND

FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

01/13/2022: FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING ON ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SET FOR 5-6-22 AT 8:30 AM SPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON ASSETS - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUED TO 2-17-21 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WEATHER ON 2-10-21, THE SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET WILL BE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE: THE COURTHOUSE CLOSED DUE TO BAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE TO JACOB A WEST - NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING SET FOR 2-10-21 AT 9:00 AM SPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM & ISSUE ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less