This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 09/16/2021 at 06:54:48 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC V. VANESSA WOODSON

Case Summary

On 06/19/2018 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANESSA WOODSON. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0099

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

WOODSON, VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROGERS III, JOSEPH H

P. O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

JORDAN, RYAN S.

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE RETURNED SUMMONS-SERVED 07-28-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK RECOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less