This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 11:50:48 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC v. Shackelford, Kymberly A

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 Cavalry SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shackelford, Kymberly A. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-343

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Defendant

Shackelford, Kymberly A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Love Beal and Nixon PC

Attorney at Love Beal and Nixon PC

C/O Jim Belcher, Service Agent, P.O. Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

07/05/2018: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

07/05/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED KYMBERLY A. SHACKELFORD PERSONALLY ON 7-16-2018/PPS

07/27/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED KYMBERLY A. SHACKELFORD PERSONALLY ON 7-16-2018/PPS

ANSWER (DEFENDANT, PRO SE)

08/06/2018: ANSWER (DEFENDANT, PRO SE)

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

11/13/2018: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/26/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

12/06/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

03/15/2019: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

04/01/2019: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN; Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED;; Party Details; Defendant: Shackelford, Kymberly A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN; Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: Plain 's motion for summary judgment; Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC; Docket: Phillip C. Corley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SUSTAINING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (JUDGE CORLEY); Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE CORLEY: THIS CASE COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. PLAIN APPEARS BY COUNSEL. THE MOTION IS SUSTAINED AND PLAIN GRANTED JUDGMENT AS PER ORDER ENTERED.; Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING; Party: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-588911 ON 11/13/2018. PAYOR: LOVE BEAL AND NIXON PC FOR CAVALRY SPV TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2018-343: $50.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less