This case was last updated from Pontotoc County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 12:53:56 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC V. MAX E. MAXWELL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MAX E MAXWELL. This case was filed in Pontotoc County Courts, Pontotoc County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KESSINGER, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0224

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pontotoc, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KESSINGER, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

MAXWELL, MAX E.

 

Court Documents

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/08/2018: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SATISFACTIN OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER - $20.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER - $51.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER (NOTHING WITHHELD DUE TO PRIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEPOSIT BY SHADID & ASSOCIATES CK $229.14

    Read MoreRead Less