This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 04/16/2022 at 15:34:19 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC, Plaintiff, v. KIM HOUDSHELT, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 CAVALRY SPV I LLC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIM HOUDSHELT, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4375

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

HOUDSHELT, KIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIXON, WILLIAM L JR

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL, & NIXON, P.C.

P.O. Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/08/2018: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/03/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / PERS SRVD / ON 6-25-18 / TO KIM HOUDSHELT / BY PS

07/12/2018: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / PERS SRVD / ON 6-25-18 / TO KIM HOUDSHELT / BY PS

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

09/20/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/15/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)- KIM HOUDSHELT \ MIDFIRST BANK, SSB

11/29/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)- KIM HOUDSHELT \ MIDFIRST BANK, SSB

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY / MIDFIRST BANK / $525.43 PAID TO PLAIN

12/17/2018: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY / MIDFIRST BANK / $525.43 PAID TO PLAIN

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT /

02/11/2019: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT /

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED; Other; Party Details; Defendant: HOUDSHELT, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCode: DISPDMRS; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT /; Count: 1; Party: HOUDSHELT, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT /; Party: HOUDSHELT, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY / MIDFIRST BANK / $525.43 PAID TO PLAIN; Party: HOUDSHELT, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-3860814 ON 11/29/2018. PAYOR: LOVE, BEAL, NIXON TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 66.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-4375: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-4375: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-4375: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-4375: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-4375: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-4375: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-4375: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less