This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 06:14:21 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC, Plaintiff, v. Joe R Petty, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Cavalry SPV I LLC, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joe R Petty, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-54

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Defendant

Petty, Joe R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooley, Neil

Attorney at Love Beal & Nixon P C

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

01/24/2020: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/19/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

07/17/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

10/01/2020: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

10/01/2020: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT) (TULSA FEDERAL EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION)

08/13/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT) (TULSA FEDERAL EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION)

BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

09/07/2021: BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT) (TULSA FEDERAL EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION)

11/02/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT) (TULSA FEDERAL EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION)

BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

11/19/2021: BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-653071 ON 11/02/2021. PAYOR: EZ MESSENGER LOVE, BEAL & NIXON TRUST ACCOUNT TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-54: $26.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-54: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-54: $8.90 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-54: $4.65 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-54: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-54: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-54: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-54: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less