This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 22:25:50 (UTC).

Castillo, Emilio v. Griffin, Carlos

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Castillo, Emilio filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Griffin, Carlos. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Stinson, Sheila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-127

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Stinson, Sheila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Castillo, Emilio

Defendants

Griffin, Carlos

American Red Cross

Fossie, Sherron

Griffin, Emerald

Ingram, Diana

Johnson, Marilyn

Mortgage Electronic Registration System

Plesant, Wilma

Security National Mortgage Company

Sherfield, Curtis

Sherfield, Kristi

State Of Oklahoma

Sullivan, Leonard

Temple Ayers, Janice

The Bank Of New York Mellon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Baker, Tessa

Attorney at OKLAHOMA ESTATE ATTORNEYS, PLLC

2909 Nw 156Th Street

Edmond, OK 73013

Monks, H Terrell

2909 Nw 156Th St.

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO QUIET TITLE

01/21/2022: PETITION TO QUIET TITLE

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

01/21/2022: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12072209--PUBLISHER'S FEE $202.53--PAID DIRECT

02/09/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD--ORDER #12072209--PUBLISHER'S FEE $202.53--PAID DIRECT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO CURTIS SHERFIELD SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/28/22

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO CURTIS SHERFIELD SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/28/22

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO KRISTI SHERFIELD SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/28/22

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO KRISTI SHERFIELD SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/28/22

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO CARLOS GRIFFIN SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 2/4/22

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO CARLOS GRIFFIN SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 2/4/22

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO MARILYN JOHNSON SIGN BY ILLEG. NO DELIVERY DATE SHOWN

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO MARILYN JOHNSON SIGN BY ILLEG. NO DELIVERY DATE SHOWN

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO SECURITY NATIONAL MORTGAGE CO. C/O CORP. SERV. CO SIGN BY G. PARRISH ON 1/28/22

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO SECURITY NATIONAL MORTGAGE CO. C/O CORP. SERV. CO SIGN BY G. PARRISH ON 1/28/22

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO JANICE TEMPLE AYERS SIGN BY J. AYERS ON 2/9/22

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO JANICE TEMPLE AYERS SIGN BY J. AYERS ON 2/9/22

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EMERALD GRIFFIN SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 2/4/22

02/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EMERALD GRIFFIN SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 2/4/22

DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

03/01/2022: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT SECURITYNATIONAL MORTGAGE COMPANY-DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

03/08/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT SECURITYNATIONAL MORTGAGE COMPANY-DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

03/08/2022: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: D; Description: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL., OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT SECURITYNATIONAL MORTGAGE COMPANY-DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: D; Description: DISCLAIMER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL. OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EMERALD GRIFFIN SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 2/4/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO JANICE TEMPLE AYERS SIGN BY J. AYERS ON 2/9/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO SECURITY NATIONAL MORTGAGE CO. C/O CORP. SERV. CO SIGN BY G. PARRISH ON 1/28/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO MARILYN JOHNSON SIGN BY ILLEG. NO DELIVERY DATE SHOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO CARLOS GRIFFIN SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 2/4/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO KRISTI SHERFIELD SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/28/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO CURTIS SHERFIELD SIGN BY ILLEG. ON 1/28/22

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: QUIET; Description: QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: QUIET TITLE(QUIET); Filed By: Castillo, Emilio; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAKER, TESSA