This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/11/2023 at 06:44:23 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0087

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL.

Defendant

$1, 660.00 IN UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BATEMAN-WOODS, STACY S.

 

Court Documents

FILE NOITCE OF SEZIURE AND FORFEITURE

07/30/2020: FILE NOITCE OF SEZIURE AND FORFEITURE

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

09/27/2021: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

09/27/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

06/02/2022: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

06/07/2022: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

06/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOITCE OF SEZIURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less