This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/15/2023 at 03:36:54 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MIKE AARON ANNANDERS AND MARILYN RUTH ANNANDERS

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR MIKE AARON ANNANDERS AND MARILYN RUTH ANNANDERS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MUELLER, EMILY J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0122

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MUELLER, EMILY J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNANDERS, MIKE AARON

Defendant

ANNANDERS, MARILYN RUTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, GREG

DOCKREY, AMANDA C.

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

05/09/2023: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE GREG WILSON ON BEHALF OF THE

05/09/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE GREG WILSON ON BEHALF OF THE

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE MARILYN ANNANDERS WAS SERVED ON

05/23/2023: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE MARILYN ANNANDERS WAS SERVED ON

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AMANDA DOCKREY ON BEHALF OF

05/25/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AMANDA DOCKREY ON BEHALF OF

FILE RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR

05/25/2023: FILE RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR

FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

05/25/2023: FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE MARILYN ANNANDERS WAS SERVED

05/31/2023: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE MARILYN ANNANDERS WAS SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 5-21-23 (113)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE MARILYN ANNANDERS WAS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AMANDA DOCKREY ON BEHALF OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 5-21-23 (50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE MARILYN ANNANDERS WAS SERVED ON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less