*********0055
05/14/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture
Pottawatomie, Oklahoma
CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.
THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL.
2005 VOLKSWAGON JETTA, BEARIING
05/14/2020: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE
02/05/2021: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON
03/10/2021: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON
04/29/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
10/14/2021: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
10/14/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
11/29/2021: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE- ANTHONY HAWKS SERVED 11-9-21
06/02/2022: FILE MOTION AAPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
06/06/2022: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION AAPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE- ANTHONY HAWKS SERVED 11-9-21
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
[-] Read LessHearingEvent: CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
[-] Read LessHearingEvent: CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT 3:30 IN COURTROOM #1
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE NEXT CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET FOR APRIL29, 2021
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT 3:30 IN COURTROOM #1
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE NEXT CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET FOR APRIL 15, 2021
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON
[-] Read LessDocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE
[-] Read Less