This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 07/20/2023 at 00:46:15 (UTC).

IN RE: FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JERI D WILLIAMS AND MICHAEL A WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 06/14/2023 IN RE FAMILY AND DOMESTIC PROCEEDINGS FOR JERI D WILLIAMS AND MICHAEL A WILLIAMS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0151

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, JERI D

Defendant

WILLIAMS, MICHAEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILSON, GREG

SUTTON, PAUL

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

06/14/2023: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL A WILLIAMS WAS SERVED

06/22/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL A WILLIAMS WAS SERVED

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE GREG WILSON ON BEHALF OF THE

06/30/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE GREG WILSON ON BEHALF OF THE

FILE RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM

06/30/2023: FILE RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM

FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM

07/11/2023: FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM

 

Docket Entries

07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S COUNTERCLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONSE AND COUNTERCLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE GREG WILSON ON BEHALF OF THE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ON 6-16-23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL A WILLIAMS WAS SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Amount: $ 183.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less