This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/17/2023 at 00:54:39 (UTC).

THE APPLICATION OF: THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL., CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 THE APPLICATION OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL , CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0052

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL.

Defendants

ONE (1) BUICK LACROSSE, BEARING

ONE (1) SILVER AND BLACK

 

Court Documents

FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

05/14/2020: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON

02/05/2021: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON

FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON

03/10/2021: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

04/29/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

10/14/2021: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

10/14/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

06/02/2022: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

06/06/2022: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2021

HearingEvent: CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021

HearingEvent: CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 3:30 IN COURTROOM #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE NEXT CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET FOR APRIL 29, 2021 AT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AT 3:30 IN COURTROOM #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: THE NEXT CIVIL DISPOSITION DOCKET FOR APRIL 15, 2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE- THE ABOVE MENTIONED CASE IS SET ON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF SEIZURE AND FORFEITURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less