This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 07:08:32 (UTC).

CAR MART OF SAPULPA V. CALEB MICHAEL STEWART

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 CAR MART OF SAPULPA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALEB MICHAEL STEWART. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WOOLERY, RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0545

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WOOLERY, RICHARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAR MART OF SAPULPA

Defendant

STEWART, CALEB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED (OVER $5000)

08/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED (OVER $5000)

AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED CALEB STEWART ON 9-9-18

10/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED CALEB STEWART ON 9-9-18

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED

11/02/2018: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED

CERT MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

03/14/2022: CERT MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

GARNISHEE'S ANSWER - TERMINATED 2-8-22

03/21/2022: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER - TERMINATED 2-8-22

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER - TERMINATED 2-8-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% CASA, COJC, CHS TO DISTRICT COURT REV FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% CASA, COJC, CHS TO REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED (OVER $5000); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less