This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 04/01/2022 at 09:14:23 (UTC).

Capital One NA, Plaintiff, v. Katherine V Cox, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Capital One NA, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Katherine. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Condren, Sheila A. and Nigh, Sue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-431

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Condren, Sheila A.

Nigh, Sue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One NA

Defendant

Cox, Katherine V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tait, Nicholas

Rausch Sturm Llp, Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

Tipton, Brianna

Attorney at Machol & Johannes, LLC

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

Defendant Attorney

Parsons, Clint R

1408 South Denver Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT

06/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT

PETITION

06/21/2021: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WITH SUMMONS ATTACHED (PPS / KATHERINE COX - 7-10-21)

07/28/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WITH SUMMONS ATTACHED (PPS / KATHERINE COX - 7-10-21)

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/24/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

09/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE THE AUGUST 24, 2021 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER PLEADING OUT-OF-TIME

11/12/2021: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE THE AUGUST 24, 2021 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER PLEADING OUT-OF-TIME

ORDER TO SET HEARING

12/06/2021: ORDER TO SET HEARING

JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY CLINT PARSONS PRESENT FOR DEF. CASE COMES ON FOR DEF MOTION TO VACATE. PROPER NOTICE WAS NOT GIVEN. CASE CONT'D TO 2-9-22 @ 1:30PM BEFORE JUDGE NIGH.

12/22/2021: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY CLINT PARSONS PRESENT FOR DEF. CASE COMES ON FOR DEF MOTION TO VACATE. PROPER NOTICE WAS NOT GIVEN. CASE CONT'D TO 2-9-22 @ 1:30PM BEFORE JUDGE NIGH.

ORDER AND NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING

01/06/2022: ORDER AND NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

02/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS

02/08/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS

NIGH PLF'S ATTY, NICHOLAS TAIT, NOT PRESENT DFT PRESENT BY ATTY CLINT PARSONS COMES ON FOR DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE CRT CONTINUES MATTER TO ALLOW DFT TO SEND NOTICE TO ATTY TAIT DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE RESET 3-9-2022 AT 1:30 PM

02/09/2022: NIGH PLF'S ATTY, NICHOLAS TAIT, NOT PRESENT DFT PRESENT BY ATTY CLINT PARSONS COMES ON FOR DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE CRT CONTINUES MATTER TO ALLOW DFT TO SEND NOTICE TO ATTY TAIT DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE RESET 3-9-2022 AT 1:30 PM

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT

03/07/2022: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT

NIGH DFT PRESENT BY ATTY CLINT PARSONS DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE STRICKEN PER AGREED ORDER PREVIOUSLY FILED

03/09/2022: NIGH DFT PRESENT BY ATTY CLINT PARSONS DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE STRICKEN PER AGREED ORDER PREVIOUSLY FILED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/23/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE*; Docket: Sue Nigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NIGH; DFT PRESENT BY ATTY CLINT PARSONS; DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE STRICKEN PER AGREED ORDER PREVIOUSLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: VACATED (ORDER OR JUDGMENT); Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Cox, Katherine V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AGORD; Description: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: Dft's Motion to Vacate*; Docket: Sue Nigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: NIGH; PLF'S ATTY, NICHOLAS TAIT, NOT PRESENT; DFT PRESENT BY ATTY CLINT PARSONS; COMES ON FOR DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE; CRT CONTINUES MATTER TO ALLOW DFT TO SEND NOTICE TO ATTY TAIT; DFT'S MOTION TO VACATE RESET 3-9-2022 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OSH; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Capital One NA; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT

    Read MoreRead Less