This case was last updated from Craig County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 06:06:47 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK V. JEREMY BLACK

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEREMY BLACK. This case was filed in Craig County Courts, Craig County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR, HONORABLE SHAWN S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0020

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Craig, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR, HONORABLE SHAWN S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

BLACK, JEREMY

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

04/09/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS' AND SAILORS' CIVIL RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE BY CERT. MAIL; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less