This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 02:04:28 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA V. SUSAN SMITH

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUSAN SMITH. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY, CLARK E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0093

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUEY, CLARK E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

SMITH, SUSAN

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/11/2021: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF

06/11/2021: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/10/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

03/23/2022: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT. OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS W/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED CHRISTINA ESQUIVEL 06/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less