This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/05/2022 at 09:19:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA V. RODNEY R. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODNEY R WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BUTNER, GEORGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0147

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BUTNER, GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, RODNEY R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROGERS III., JOSEPH H.

4401 N. Classen Ste 500

Okc, OK 73118

JORDAN, RYAN S.

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN RECEIPT ELECTRONIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POST-JUDGMENT GENERAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS RETURNED /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON-CONTINUING AND GENERAL GARNISHMENT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less