This case was last updated from Wagoner County Courts on 02/16/2022 at 00:44:09 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA V. KRISTI S SIMPSON

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KRISTI S SIMPSON. This case was filed in Wagoner County Courts, Wagoner County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKLEY, DOUGLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0333

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wagoner, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKLEY, DOUGLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

SIMPSON, KRISTI S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROGERS, JOSEPH H III

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

PETITION ($10,000 OR LESS)

05/29/2018: PETITION ($10,000 OR LESS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS W/RETURN, KRISTI S SIMPSON NOT AT GIVEN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILORS' CIVIL RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMNS (1) ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION ($10,000 OR LESS); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less