This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 03/13/2022 at 08:42:25 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. V. JOHN WALLACE

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN WALLACE. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CULVER, MCAFFREY & DENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0148

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CULVER, MCAFFREY & DENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

Defendant

WALLACE, JOHN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/16/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS, CLAIM & NOTICE ISSUED

05/27/2021: SUMMONS, CLAIM & NOTICE ISSUED

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

09/16/2021: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND- EFFECTIVE 1-1-05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION $10,000 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less