This case was last updated from Stephens County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 09:57:29 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA V. CALEB M. RUSS

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CALEB M RUSS. This case was filed in Stephens County Courts, Stephens County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is RUSSELL, G. BRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********161R

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Stephens, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

RUSSELL, G. BRENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

RUSS, CALEB M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: ST:COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT GBR AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 9:30 AM GBR AB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION DOCKET MINUTE: CONT'D TO NEXT DOCKET 12-11-20 @

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT FOR 11/13/2020 @ 9:30 AM GBR/LG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1/1/05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENT PETITION EH W/CS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less