This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 21:27:53 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Plaintiff, v. Patty K Mckee, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Capital One Bank USA , N A , Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Patty K Mckee, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Burton, Catherine M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-591

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Burton, Catherine M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Mckee, Patty K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Declercq, Aubrey E

P.O.Box 32728

Okc, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: PATTY K MCKEE BY LEAVING WITH CO-RESIDENT (REFUSED NAME). 2-6-20

02/12/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: PATTY K MCKEE BY LEAVING WITH CO-RESIDENT (REFUSED NAME). 2-6-20

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/17/2020: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT

01/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

05/22/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

05/29/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED PER HELP DESK 102666

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERTS; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; Default Judgment; Party Details; Defendant: Mckee, Patty K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDJ; Description: WALKE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED; Count: 1; Party: Mckee, Patty K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: PATTY K MCKEE BY LEAVING WITH CO-RESIDENT (REFUSED NAME). 2-6-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-4750718 ON 01/21/2020. PAYOR: MACHOL & JOHANNES LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-591: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-591: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2020-591: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-591: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-591: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-591: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2020-591: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-591: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-591: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-591: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2020-591: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2020-591: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less