This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 16:45:26 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA, Plaintiff, v. MATTHEW ORTON, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATTHEW ORTON, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hatfield, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-898

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hatfield, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

ORTON, MATTHEW

Mustang, OK 73064-0774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DECLERCQ, AUBREY E

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

TIPTON, BRIANNA

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

VALERGA, BRODY

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED

09/09/2021: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

09/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FILED

09/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED

10/04/2021: ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED

02/01/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED

STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED

06/27/2022: STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AGR; Description: STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED; Party: ORTON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-680180 ON 09/09/2021. PAYOR: MACHOL & JOHANNES LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 226.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-898: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2021-898: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2021-898: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-898: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2021-898: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-898: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2021-898: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2021-898: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-898: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-898: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2021-898: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE HATFIELD, BARBARA TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED; Count: 1; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALERGA, BRODY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIPTON, BRIANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Declercq, Aubrey E