This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 07/13/2022 at 15:12:38 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA, Plaintiff, v. JONATHAN HODGE, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONATHAN HODGE, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hatfield, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-899

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hatfield, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

HODGE, JONATHAN

Yukon, OK 73099-9277

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DECLERCQ, AUBREY E

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

VALERGA, BRODY

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

TIPTON, BRIANNA

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED

09/09/2021: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

09/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FILED

09/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED

10/04/2021: ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

11/15/2021: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

12/01/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED

02/01/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

02/10/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED

04/04/2022: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket- SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: HODGE, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket - DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. STRICKEN TO BE RESET PURSUANT TO PHONE CALL FROM PLAIN 'S COUNSEL. JUDGE HATFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MODJ; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED // FILED; Party: HODGE, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FILED; Count: 1; Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALERGA, BRODY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIPTON, BRIANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Declercq, Aubrey E