This case was last updated from Adair County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 18:59:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., Plaintiff, v. JASON N KELLEY, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A , Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON N KELLEY, Defendant. This case was filed in Adair County Courts, Adair County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, L. Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-100

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Adair, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, L. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

KELLEY, JASON N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, JOSEPH H III

P O Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

PETITION

07/12/2018: PETITION

SUMMONS FEE JASON N KELLEY

07/12/2018: SUMMONS FEE JASON N KELLEY

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JASON N KELLEY

10/22/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JASON N KELLEY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

02/01/2019: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: KELLEY, JASON N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISM; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Party: KELLEY, JASON N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: JASON N KELLEY; Party: KELLEY, JASON N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILORS' CIVIL RELIEF ACT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: KELLEY, JASON N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-114215 ON 07/12/2018. PAYOR: MACHOL & JOHANNES, LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 229.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-100: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-100: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2018-100: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-100: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-100: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-100: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2018-100: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-100: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-100: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-100: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2018-100: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BROWN, L. ELIZABETH TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE JASON N KELLEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMINCSF; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less