This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 01:58:34 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N A V. JAMES L. BODLEY

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES L BODLEY. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KANE, M JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0237

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KANE, M JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N A

Defendant

BODLEY, JAMES L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RET NOT SERVING RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILORS' CIVIL RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BODLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTY FOR SERVICE ON JAMES L.; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less