This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 01/04/2023 at 01:36:12 (UTC).

Capital One Bank, Plaintiff, v. Sterling Battice, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 Capital One Bank, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sterling Battice, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-29

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank

Defendant

Battice, Sterling

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACHOL & JOHANNES, LLC

Attorney at MACHOL & JOHANNES, LLC

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STERLING BATTICE

07/18/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STERLING BATTICE

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

05/21/2018: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

02/01/2019: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS FEE

05/21/2018: SUMMONS FEE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE;; Party Details; Defendant: Battice, Sterling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STERLING BATTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF ACT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-75224 ON 05/21/2018. PAYOR: MACHOL & JOHANNES, LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 229.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-29: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-29: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2018-29: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-29: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-29: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-29: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2018-29: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-29: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-29: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-29: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2018-29: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMINCSF; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 1.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Capital One Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less