This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 04:47:54 (UTC).

Capital One Bank, Plaintiff, v. Darlene Hurtt, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2018 Capital One Bank, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Darlene Hurtt, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-32

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank

Defendant

Hurtt, Darlene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Machol & Johannes Llc

Attorney at Machol & Johannes Llc

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

05/29/2018: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

APPEARANCE

07/12/2018: APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: DARLENE HURTT

08/13/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: DARLENE HURTT

SUMMONS FEE

05/29/2018: SUMMONS FEE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: DARLENE HURTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIERS AND SAILORS COVIL RELIEF ACT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-75278 ON 05/29/2018. PAYOR: MACHOL & JOHANNES LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 229.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-32: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-32: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2018-32: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-32: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-32: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-32: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2018-32: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-32: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-32: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-32: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2018-32: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Capital One Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less