This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 10:15:47 (UTC).

Capital One Bank, Plaintiff, v. Angela Howze, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Capital One Bank, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Angela Howze, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****20-5

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank

Defendant

Howze, Angela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rogers, Joseph H III

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

08/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/23/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/06/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/06/2020: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANGELA HOWZE

06/08/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANGELA HOWZE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERTS; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Howze, Angela

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAIN 'S JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: ANGELA HOWZE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-83485 ON 01/17/2020. PAYOR: MACHOL & JOHANNES TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-5: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-5: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2020-5: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-5: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-5: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-5: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2020-5: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-5: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-5: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-5: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2020-5: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2020-5: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Capital One Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less