This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 07/13/2021 at 07:25:58 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK N.A. V. CODY J SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK N A filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CODY J SMITH. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDEN, DOUGLAS W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0390

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDEN, DOUGLAS W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK N.A.

Defendant

SMITH, CODY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROGERS, JOSEPH H III

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF

07/24/2018: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILORS CIVIL RELIEF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO CODY SMITH 8-21-18 - PSS

08/31/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO CODY SMITH 8-21-18 - PSS

AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/10/2018: AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER - TINKER FEDERAL CU - NO FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: UNION; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED - TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less