This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 11/22/2022 at 00:16:55 (UTC).

CACH, LLC V. CHRISTINE SAMS

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 CACH, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CHRISTINE SAMS. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0412

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

SAMS, CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/15/2018: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILE GARNISHEMENT SUMMONS & RETURN- SERVED 7-1-19

10/08/2019: FILE GARNISHEMENT SUMMONS & RETURN- SERVED 7-1-19

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

06/13/2019: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/15/2018: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

05/30/2018: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE SUMMONS AND RETURN - CHRISTINE SAMS SERVED BY

08/13/2018: FILE SUMMONS AND RETURN - CHRISTINE SAMS SERVED BY

FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

07/05/2019: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEMENT SUMMONS & RETURN- SERVED 7-1-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE GARN. SUMM.; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less