This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 03/14/2022 at 06:54:30 (UTC).

Brittany Square Investors Llc Dba, Plaintiff, and BRITTANY SQUARE APARTMENTS, Plaintiff, v. Erika Gonzalez, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Brittany Square Investors Llc Dba, Plaintiff, and BRITTANY SQUARE APARTMENTS, Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Erika Gonzalez, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2037

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRITTANY SQUARE APARTMENTS

Brittany Square Investors Llc Dba

Defendant

Gonzalez, Erika

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIERSON, N BLAINE

1126 South Frankfort Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

KNOPP, KELLY

1126 S Frankfort Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorney

YODER, STEPHEN ERIC

Attorney at LEGAL AID SERVICES OF OKLAHOMA INC 907 DETROIT AVENUE SUITE 725

Tulsa, OK 74120

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT

VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE W/ CARES ACT

03/02/2021: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE W/ CARES ACT

FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER SERVED - POSTED TO DOOR 3/3/21

03/12/2021: FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER SERVED - POSTED TO DOOR 3/3/21

AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR TENANTS - SIGNED AND FILED

03/19/2021: AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR TENANTS - SIGNED AND FILED

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDENT STEPHEN ERIC YODER OBA #34403

03/23/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDENT STEPHEN ERIC YODER OBA #34403

DISMISSAL

04/21/2021: DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: UCLET; Description: UNCLAIMED LETTER - ERIKA GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Deborrah Ludi Leitch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Dismissed- Settled; Party Details; Defendant: Gonzalez, Erika

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPDWOP; Description: DISMISSAL; Count: 1; Party: Gonzalez, Erika

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Deborrah Ludi Leitch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: LUDI LEITCH, DEBORRAH: CASE RESET PER AGREEMENT OF PARTIES TO 4-22-2021 @ 2:00 PM , CASE STRICKEN FROM DOCKET ON 4-20-2021JUDGE OUT OF OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDENT; STEPHEN ERIC YODER OBA #34403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR TENANTS - SIGNED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Deborrah Ludi Leitch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: LUDI LEITCH, DEBORRAH: PLAIN ATTORNEY KELLY KNOPP APPEARED DEFENDANT APPEARED WITH ATTORNEY ERIC YODER CASE UNDER ADVISEMENT UNTIL 4-20-2021 @ 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE W/ CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: A/; Description: AMOUNT IN DEBT OF - LEASE VIOLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: BRITTANY SQUARE APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less