This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 03/29/2022 at 06:33:13 (UTC).

BREIT INVESTMENT CORP, D/B/A CASH EXPRESS OF YUKON, Plaintiff, v. RENE A HERNANDEZ, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 BREIT INVESTMENT CORP, D/B/A CASH EXPRESS OF YUKON, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENE A HERNANDEZ, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1323

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BREIT INVESTMENT CORP

CASH EXPRESS OF YUKON

Defendant

HERNANDEZ, RENE A

Garnishee

EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARTON, W CRAIG

123 Nw 23Rd Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. AFFIDAVIT/ORDER//FILED $844.00 FOR FAILURE TO PAY ON A LOAN CONTRACT

08/08/2018: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. AFFIDAVIT/ORDER//FILED $844.00 FOR FAILURE TO PAY ON A LOAN CONTRACT

PROCESS SERVER'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT/ORDER//FILED RENE A HERNANDEZ WAS SERVED BY LEAVING A TRUE COPY WITH HISPANIC ADULT MALE, A RESIDENT 15 Y/O OR OLDER, ON 9-24-2018 **NO FEE INDICATED**

09/25/2018: PROCESS SERVER'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT/ORDER//FILED RENE A HERNANDEZ WAS SERVED BY LEAVING A TRUE COPY WITH HISPANIC ADULT MALE, A RESIDENT 15 Y/O OR OLDER, ON 9-24-2018 **NO FEE INDICATED**

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE//FILED

10/01/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE//FILED

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT//FILED

10/01/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT//FILED

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT//FILED

10/17/2018: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT//FILED

CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC ($1,293.04)

10/17/2018: CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC ($1,293.04)

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT//FILED

11/09/2018: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT//FILED

PROCESS SERVER'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON ISSUED COPY OF CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS//FILED EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC WAS SERVED BY LEAVING A TRUE COPY WITH SHARRON COMBS, AS AGENT, ON 10-30-2018 **NO FEE INDICATED** (PROCESS SER

12/10/2018: PROCESS SERVER'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON ISSUED COPY OF CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS//FILED EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC WAS SERVED BY LEAVING A TRUE COPY WITH SHARRON COMBS, AS AGENT, ON 10-30-2018 **NO FEE INDICATED** (PROCESS SERVER DID NOT RETURN OUR ORIGINAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSS; Description: PROCESS SERVER'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON ISSUED COPY OF CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS//FILED EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC WAS SERVED BY LEAVING A TRUE COPY WITH SHARRON COMBS, AS AGENT, ON 10-30-2018 **NO FEE INDICATED** (PROCESS SERVER DID NOT RETURN OUR ORIGINAL); Party: EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT//FILED; Party: EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-578445 ON 10/17/2018. PAYOR: BREIT INVESTMENT CORP TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 106.64. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-1323: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-1323: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-1323: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. SC-2018-1323: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-1323: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. SC-2018-1323: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. SC-2018-1323: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLTF FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGY LLC ($1,293.04); Party: BREIT INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: PROCESS SERVER'S RETURN OF SERVICE ON ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT/ORDER//FILED RENE A HERNANDEZ WAS SERVED BY LEAVING A TRUE COPY WITH HISPANIC ADULT MALE, A RESIDENT 15 Y/O OR OLDER, ON 9-24-2018 **NO FEE INDICATED**; Party: HERNANDEZ, RENE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-570516 ON 08/08/2018. PAYOR: BREIT INVESTMENT CORP TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-1323: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2018-1323: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2018-1323: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE JUDGE NOT LISTED TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER ISSUED TO PLTF FOR SERVICE BY PPS ON RENE A HERNANDEZ (HEARING SET FOR 10-1-2018 @ 1:30PM BEFORE JUDGE JACK MCCURDY); Party: BREIT INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT1; Description: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. AFFIDAVIT/ORDER//FILED $844.00 FOR FAILURE TO PAY ON A LOAN CONTRACT; Count: 1; Party: BREIT INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS less than $5000.00.(SCINDEBT1); Filed By: BREIT INVESTMENT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less