This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 20:48:33 (UTC).

BRADLEY SMITH, Plaintiff, v. DUSTIN PAUL AMEND, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 BRADLEY SMITH, Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DUSTIN PAUL AMEND, Defendant. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-79

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, BRADLEY

Defendant

AMEND, DUSTIN PAUL

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. // AFFIDAVIT - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER FILED POSSESSION ONLY

01/20/2022: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. // AFFIDAVIT - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER FILED POSSESSION ONLY

SUMMONS - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER ISSUED - SHERIFF

01/20/2022: SUMMONS - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER ISSUED - SHERIFF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

01/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

SUMMONS - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER RETURN FILED SERVED: DUSTIN PERSONALLY 1/24/2022

01/26/2022: SUMMONS - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER RETURN FILED SERVED: DUSTIN PERSONALLY 1/24/2022

EARLY SETTLEMENT DISPUTE MEDIATION PROGRAM MEDIATION AGREEMENT FILED

01/31/2022: EARLY SETTLEMENT DISPUTE MEDIATION PROGRAM MEDIATION AGREEMENT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING // SMALL CLAIMS (FED); Party: SMITH,BRADLEY; Docket: Barbara Hatfield

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. PLAIN FAILS TO APPEAR. DEFENDANT FAILS TO APPEAR. HEARING STRICKEN FOR NO APPEARANCES. JUDGE HATFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING // SMALL CLAIMS (FED); Party: SMITH,BRADLEY; Docket: Khristan K. Strubhar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: CRT MIN. PLAIN APPEARS, PRO SE, AT 2:00 P.M. TIME CHANGED ON PLAIN 'S DOCUMENT. DEFENDANT APPEARS, PRO SE. MEDIATION AGREEMENT SIGNED. CASE CONTINUED TO 02-07-2022 @ 2:00. JUDGE STRUBHAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AGR; Description: EARLY SETTLEMENT DISPUTE MEDIATION PROGRAM MEDIATION AGREEMENT FILED; Party: SMITH, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER RETURN FILED SERVED: DUSTIN PERSONALLY 1/24/2022; Party: AMEND, DUSTIN PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-691773 ON 01/20/2022. PAYOR: SMITH/BRADLEY A TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 119.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2022-79: $54.60 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2022-79: $48.75 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. SC-2022-79: $2.98 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. SC-2022-79: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2022-79: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:SC-2022-79: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18SC-2022-79: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15SC-2022-79: AC08 SHERIFF FEES -$1.25SC-2022-79: AC01 CLERK FEES -$1.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ADJUST; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO AC09-CARD ALLOCATION; Amount: $ 2.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE JUDGE NOT LISTED TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED; Party: SMITH, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: COPY; Description: COPIES CHARGED; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: MSF; Description: MAILING SERVICE FEE (PER PERSON); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIS; Description: SUMMONS - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER ISSUED - SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING. // AFFIDAVIT - FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER FILED POSSESSION ONLY; Party: SMITH, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER less than $5000.00.(SCFED1); Filed By: SMITH, BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less