This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 07:35:56 (UTC).

BELL FINANCIAL SERVICES LTD V. TRACI COLBERT

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 BELL FINANCIAL SERVICES LTD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRACI COLBERT. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BAZE, BILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0172

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BAZE, BILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCIAL SERVICES LTD

Defendant

COLBERT, TRACI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GREEN CARD RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILING FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER (Civil,Divorce,S.C.,Adop.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: $951.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER, DEFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT/ORDER TO:; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less