This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 23:51:34 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE V. TIFFANY WOLLMAN

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 BELL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TIFFANY WOLLMAN. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE

Defendant

WOLLMAN, TIFFANY

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER UNDER 5000.00

02/08/2021: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER UNDER 5000.00

1ST ALIAS ISS'D TO HCSO

02/22/2021: 1ST ALIAS ISS'D TO HCSO

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

03/08/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER FILED (STRICKENSERVALIAS)

02/22/2021: ORDER FILED (STRICKENSERVALIAS)

AFF RETURNED NOT SERVED FILED

02/22/2021: AFF RETURNED NOT SERVED FILED

1ST ALIAS AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED FILED

02/23/2021: 1ST ALIAS AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED FILED

RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

09/13/2021: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

CARD SIGNED RETURNED FILED

06/01/2022: CARD SIGNED RETURNED FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CARD SIGNED RETURNED FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1ST ALIAS AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVED FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFF RETURNED NOT SERVED FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FILED (STRICKEN;SERV;ALIAS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 1ST ALIAS ISS'D TO HCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHF FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER UNDER 5000.00; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less