This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 13:13:03 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE V. RUSHON CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 BELL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUSHON CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERING, CYNTHIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0468

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERING, CYNTHIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE

Defendant

CHANDLER, RUSHON CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/MAILING

11/06/2019: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/MAILING

GREEN CARD RET'D FILED SERVED

11/18/2019: GREEN CARD RET'D FILED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($86.42)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($196.74)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($131.14)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER ($171.98)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GREEN CARD RET'D FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT EARNINGS GARNISHMENT SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV FUN; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT/MAILING; Amount: $ 73.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN AMOUNT OF $1278.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY PPS MANN TO RUSHON CHANDLER $25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE BY SPECIAL OFFICER, RET. FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT ISSUED TO RUSHON CHANDLER: PPS MANN; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less