This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 13:40:15 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE V. MIRIAH K. CAIN

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 BELL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIRIAH K CAIN. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, STEPHANIE C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0096

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, STEPHANIE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE

Defendant

CAIN, MIRIAH K.

 

Court Documents

ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

04/23/2021: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED FILE AND SCAN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

05/05/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FIL & SCANNED

ORIGINAL SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

05/05/2021: ORIGINAL SERVICE FILE AND SCAN

ORDER TO OESC FOR RELEASE OF RECORDS FILE AND SCAN

01/18/2022: ORDER TO OESC FOR RELEASE OF RECORDS FILE AND SCAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO OESC FOR RELEASE OF RECORDS; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR OESC RELEASE INFORMATION; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: CS-TRACKING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WRITING; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER TO THE OESC FOR THE RELEASE OF RECORDS IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INFORMATION ;FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING THE OESC TO RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIGINAL SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 123.50 COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 406.49 PLAINITFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUGDMENT; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY MONA MEACHAM PS 65.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEF SERVED AT 16056 WATER TOWER ROAD BINGER CADDO, CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED AND RETURNED; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; FILE AND SCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO SERVE BY PROCESS SERVER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less