This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 13:45:01 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE V. LENEL SCHARBOR

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 BELL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LENEL SCHARBOR. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0239

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE

Defendant

SCHARBOR, LENEL

 

Court Documents

ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

05/13/2021: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (MAIL FEE); Amount: $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET - JUDGE SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ST-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less