This case was last updated from McIntosh County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:21:55 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE V. KASSIE M DOBBINS

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 BELL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KASSIE M DOBBINS. This case was filed in McIntosh County Courts, McIntosh County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIDGES, BRENDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0035

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    McIntosh, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BRIDGES, BRENDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE

Defendant

DOBBINS, KASSIE M

Other

EDDIE WARRIOR CORR. CNTR.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT ISSUED MONEY JUDGEMENT OR REPLEVIN

03/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT ISSUED MONEY JUDGEMENT OR REPLEVIN

CM:(BRIDGES) SMALL CLAIM HEARING: PLTF APP, DEFD APP

04/26/2021: CM:(BRIDGES) SMALL CLAIM HEARING: PLTF APP, DEFD APP

JUDGMENT

04/26/2021: JUDGMENT

STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

04/26/2021: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

ORIGINAL RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

10/25/2021: ORIGINAL RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIGINAL RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (EMAILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT ($543.47)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOT. COURT ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF. ALL PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:(BRIDGES) SMALL CLAIM HEARING: PLTF APP, DEFD APP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 03-07-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT RET'D SERVING KASSIE DOBBINS ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT ISSUED MONEY JUDGEMENT OR REPLEVIN; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less