This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 22:43:05 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE V. EVELYN LOOPER

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 BELL FINANCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EVELYN LOOPER. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MARSH, RICKY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0058

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MARSH, RICKY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE

Defendant

LOOPER, EVELYN

 

Court Documents

FILED CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF

02/08/2022: FILED CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF

FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

11/22/2021: FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILED ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT W/ PSS RETURN OF SERVICE -

12/06/2021: FILED ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT W/ PSS RETURN OF SERVICE -

FILED ORDER. ENTER CASE BEFORE JUDGE MARSH. PLAIN

12/21/2021: FILED ORDER. ENTER CASE BEFORE JUDGE MARSH. PLAIN

FILED JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/21/2021: FILED JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILED RETURNED TO SENDER (JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/28/2021: FILED RETURNED TO SENDER (JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT (CONTINUING)

01/18/2022: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT (CONTINUING)

FILED CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT W GREEN CARD (KIOWA CO

01/24/2022: FILED CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT W GREEN CARD (KIOWA CO

FILED CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

02/08/2022: FILED CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

FILED CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF

03/07/2022: FILED CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF

FILED RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

04/05/2022: FILED RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE & SAFISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EARNINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EARNINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED CALCULATION FOR CONTINUING GARNISHMENT OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF'S DEPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT W GREEN CARD (KIOWA CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN IN THE SUM OF $419, PLUS COURT COSTS OF $108

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRESENT. DEFT NOT PRESENT. JUDGMENT GRANTED TO THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORDER. ENTER CASE BEFORE JUDGE MARSH. PLAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVED 11-20-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT W/ PSS RETURN OF SERVICE -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: SERVED BY PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less