This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 00:40:26 (UTC).

BELL FINANCE / GROVE V. STEPHANIE MANN

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 BELL FINANCE / GROVE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHANIE MANN. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LITTLEFIELD, ALICIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0059

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LITTLEFIELD, ALICIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL FINANCE / GROVE

Defendant

MANN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

03/08/2021: CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/08/2021: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURNED MAIL SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MAILED COPY TO PLAIN AND DEFENDANT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MONTH THEREAFTER UNTIL PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PAID AT $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 3/15/21 AND EACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF THE PLAIN FOR A TOTAL AMOUNT OF $1419.00 TO BE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FAILS TO APPEAR; COURT GRANTS DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET; PLAIN PRESENT BY TARA SHARP; DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BY STEVE ODLE; FEE $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE - DEFENDANT PERSONALLY SERVED 2/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING ORDER TO PLAIN FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less