This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 09:10:17 (UTC).

BANK2 V. MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BANK2 filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC,. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK2

Defendants

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

SPOUSE OF CANDACE R FRUNK

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

JANE DOE, AS OCCUPANT OF THE

JOHN DOE, AS OCCUPANT OF THE

FRUNK, CANDACE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TIMBERLAKE, DON

Po Box 18486

Okc, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

FILE APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION

03/08/2021: FILE APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/14/2021: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

01/05/2021: FILE ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

FILE ASSIGNMENT OF JUDMENT AND BID AMENDED MOTION TO

01/05/2021: FILE ASSIGNMENT OF JUDMENT AND BID AMENDED MOTION TO

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING

12/08/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

12/02/2020: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

12/02/2020: FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

FILE SECOND ALIAS NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

12/02/2020: FILE SECOND ALIAS NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

FILE SECOND ALIAS SPECIAL SHERIFF'S RETURN

12/02/2020: FILE SECOND ALIAS SPECIAL SHERIFF'S RETURN

FILE SECOND ALIAS SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

12/02/2020: FILE SECOND ALIAS SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF SECOND ALIAS NOTICE OF

11/06/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF SECOND ALIAS NOTICE OF

FILE AFFDIAVIT OF PUBLICATION

11/02/2020: FILE AFFDIAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

08/31/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

07/21/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

FIE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

07/20/2020: FIE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/23/2020: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

03/11/2020: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVIE

03/11/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVIE

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE APPRAISEMENT OF REAL ESTATE UNDER EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONFIRM SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ASSIGNMENT OF JUDMENT AND BID AMENDED MOTION TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less