This case was last updated from Woodward County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 08:16:51 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA V. RON HOLLEY

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RON HOLLEY. This case was filed in Woodward County Courts, Woodward County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKSEY, ERIN N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0205

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Woodward, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKSEY, ERIN N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

HOLLEY, RON

 

Court Documents

PETITION LESS THAN $10,000 FILED

07/06/2021: PETITION LESS THAN $10,000 FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE & SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION LESS THAN $10,000 FILED; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less