This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 01:51:11 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. V. KIMBERLY MEANS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KIMBERLY MEANS. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0054

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

MEANS, KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HOOD, NICHOLAS R.

Po Box 271

Bentonville, AR 72712

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: ST-JOURNAL ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CONSENT JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less