This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 03/30/2022 at 15:56:02 (UTC).

Bancoklahoma Mortgage Corp Et Al VS Carter, Amy Danielle Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 Bancoklahoma Mortgage Corp filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Carter, Amy Danielle. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-254

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bancoklahoma Mortgage Corp

Bank Of Oklahoma

Bank Of Oklahoma Na

BOKF NA dba

Defendants

Carter, Amy Danielle

Carter, Brandon Neil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Assink, Ryan J

Attorney at Riggs Abney, Neal Turpen, Orbison & Lewis

502 W 6Th Street

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES (PPS / WITH AMY CARTER - 7-10-18 WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED)

09/04/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES (PPS / WITH AMY CARTER - 7-10-18 WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHED)

JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY RYAN J ASSINK PRESENT FOR PLAIN . CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SIGNED.

12/12/2018: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY RYAN J ASSINK PRESENT FOR PLAIN . CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SIGNED.

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SALE OF LAND UNDER EXECUTION

11/01/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SALE OF LAND UNDER EXECUTION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

12/12/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE (SOLD TO PLTF)

11/01/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE (SOLD TO PLTF)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/05/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

11/01/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

ORDER GRANTING PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/29/2018: ORDER GRANTING PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

11/01/2018: MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY RYAN J ASSINK PRESENT FOR PLAIN . CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OSALE; Description: FINAL ORDER CONFIRMING SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOCS; Description: MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF SALE OF LAND UNDER EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOSS; Description: NOTICE OF SALE OF LAND UNDER EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APRPM; Description: APPRAISEMENT OF PROPERTY UNDER EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: BOKF NA dba

    Read MoreRead Less