This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 12:45:45 (UTC).

BABY VARGHESE V. ROBERT LEONGO

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 BABY VARGHESE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBERT LEONGO. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0044

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGHESE, BABY

Defendant

LEONGO, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE FED AFFIDAVIT/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less