This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 08/15/2022 at 17:46:01 (UTC).

BABY VARGHESE V. CHRIS TREADWAY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 BABY VARGHESE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHRIS TREADWAY. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0045

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGHESE, BABY

Defendant

TREADWAY, CHRIS

 

Court Documents

ISSUE FED AFFIDAVIT/ORDER

01/21/2022: ISSUE FED AFFIDAVIT/ORDER

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE

01/25/2022: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/07/2022: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF SERVICE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE FED AFFIDAVIT/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less