This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 03/22/2022 at 06:10:57 (UTC).

Auto Finance USA LLC, Plaintiff, v. Cynthia Michelle Clowdus, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Auto Finance USA LLC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cynthia Michelle Clowdus, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Stallings, Susan, Bonner , Anthony L. and Bonner, Anthony L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1451

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Stallings, Susan

Bonner , Anthony L.

Bonner, Anthony L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auto Finance USA LLC

Defendant

Clowdus, Cynthia Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHINZING, DANI L

Attorney at ROBINSON, HOOVER & FUDGE, PLLC

119 N. Robinson Ave., Suite 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION

04/06/2021: PETITION

APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

04/06/2021: APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: CYNTHIA MICHELLE CLOWDUS NOT FOUND

04/22/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: CYNTHIA MICHELLE CLOWDUS NOT FOUND

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

05/18/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

05/18/2021: ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12003433---PUBLISHER'S FEE $71.62---PAID DIRECT

06/07/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12003433---PUBLISHER'S FEE $71.62---PAID DIRECT

NOTICE OF HEARING OF PLAIN 'S APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC

08/19/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING OF PLAIN 'S APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

08/30/2021: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

08/30/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/30/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

09/17/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

ORDER AS TO PLAIN 'S ENTITLEMENT TO THE ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDERS

10/25/2021: ORDER AS TO PLAIN 'S ENTITLEMENT TO THE ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDERS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT SEE ANSWER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT SEE ANSWER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCode: CNOTE; Description: BONNER- ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL SIGNED *MAILED TO LIZ GEORGE FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT ; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER AS TO PLAIN 'S ENTITLEMENT TO THE ISSUANCE OF OESC ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: OESC HEARING; Party: Clowdus,CynthiaMichelle; Docket: Chief Special Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE BURTON / OESC / GRANTED BY THE COURT AS PER COURT ORDER; Party: Clowdus, Cynthia Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-5066564 ON 09/17/2021. PAYOR: ROBINSON HOOVER & FUDGE LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2021-1451: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2021-1451: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1451: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2021-1451: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1451: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2021-1451: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1451: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2021-1451: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Auto Finance USA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schinzing, Dani L