This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 09:59:49 (UTC).

Auto Advantage Finance Llc, Plaintiff, v. Gregory Stuart Don Wall, Defendant, and Mary Elise Buzzard, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Auto Advantage Finance Llc, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gregory Stuart Don Wall, Defendant, and Mary Elise Buzzard, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Hales, Nathaniel and Napoli, Jequita H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2422

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Hales, Nathaniel

Napoli, Jequita H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auto Advantage Finance Llc

Defendants

Wall, Gregory Stuart Don

Buzzard, Mary Elise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schinzing, Dani L

Attorney at ROBINSON HOOVER & FUDGE PLLC

119 N Robinson Ave Ste 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

PETITION

12/01/2020: PETITION

APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

12/01/2020: APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF PLAIN 'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO THE OESC AND REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF AN OESC ORDER

ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

03/10/2021: ATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

03/10/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

03/30/2021: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY STUART DON WALL ONLY

03/30/2021: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY STUART DON WALL ONLY

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY STUART DON WALL ONLY (JHN)

03/30/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY STUART DON WALL ONLY (JHN)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

04/06/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION / $60.63 / NOTICE BY PUBLICATION / 3-24-2021 & 3-31-2021 AND 4-7-2021 / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT

04/19/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION / $60.63 / NOTICE BY PUBLICATION / 3-24-2021 & 3-31-2021 AND 4-7-2021 / NORMAN TRANSCRIPT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MARY ELISE BUZZARD ONLY

05/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MARY ELISE BUZZARD ONLY

MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE AS TO DEFENDANT MARY ELISE BUZZARD ONLY

05/18/2021: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT NOTICE AS TO DEFENDANT MARY ELISE BUZZARD ONLY

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT MARY ELISE BUZZARD ONLY ***JHN***

05/18/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT MARY ELISE BUZZARD ONLY ***JHN***

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCode: CERTS; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / GALT FOUNDATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS (SB); Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: APPLICATION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO GARNISHMENT SUMMONS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-1183449 ON 06/23/2021. PAYOR: ROBINSON, HOOVER & FUDGE PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-2422: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-2422: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-2422: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-2422: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-2422: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-2422: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-2422: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-2422: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY/GALT FOUNDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schinzing, Dani L